This web browser is not supported. Use Chrome, Edge, Safari, or Firefox for best results.
Find clues for any answer, or answers that match a pattern
Search options:
24 total results for TOBIN( score: 50 )
2 results for TOBIN from Modern Era puzzles:
Date | Grid | Clue | Author | Editor |
Fri Dec 1, 2023 | 7D | ___ Heath, U.S. women's soccer star | Jem Burch | Shortz |
Sun Jan 1, 2023 | 60D | Soccer star ___ Heath | Adam Wagner, Michael Lieberman and Rafael Musa | Shortz |
22 results for TOBIN from pre-Shortz puzzles:
Date | Grid | Clue | Author | Editor |
Sun Feb 12, 1984 | 16A | Nobelist in Economics: 1981 | Derrick C. Niederman | Maleska |
Sat Nov 22, 1975 | 15A | Peak of Sonoma Range | Allan Blackman | Weng |
Mon Aug 12, 1957 | 61A | Former Secretary of Labor. | Albert Blum | Farrar |
Sun May 26, 1957 | 137A | Secy. of Labor, 1948-53. | Eugene T. Maleska | Farrar |
Fri Jun 17, 1955 | 29D | Member of Truman Cabinet. | Unknown | Farrar |
Thu Sep 16, 1954 | 3D | Member of Truman's Cabinet. | Thomas Meekin | Farrar |
Fri Aug 14, 1953 | 14A | Recently deceased member of Truman's Cabinet. | Eugene T. Maleska | Farrar |
Sun Dec 14, 1952 | 6A | Secretary of Labor. | Israel Gitter | Farrar |
Wed Aug 20, 1952 | 16A | Secretary of Labor. | Unknown | Farrar |
Mon Jul 21, 1952 | 26D | Secretary of Labor. | Unknown | Farrar |
Fri Mar 21, 1952 | 50A | Maurice ___, of the Cabinet. | Unknown | Farrar |
Wed Mar 5, 1952 | 53D | Secretary of Labor. | Unknown | Farrar |
Fri Feb 22, 1952 | 22D | Cabinet successor to Schwellenbach. | Unknown | Farrar |
Sun Nov 4, 1951 | 83D | Secretary of Labor. | Evelyn Smith | Farrar |
Mon Sep 17, 1951 | 1A | Secretary of Labor. | Unknown | Farrar |
Thu Jun 14, 1951 | 19A | Secretary of Labor. | Unknown | Farrar |
Wed Mar 14, 1951 | 64A | Secretary of Labor. | Unknown | Farrar |
Fri Nov 17, 1950 | 7A | President Truman's Cabinet. | Unknown | Farrar |
Sun Nov 13, 1949 | 69A | Secretary of Labor. | S. K. Fliegner | Farrar |
Sun Jun 5, 1949 | 67A | Secretary of Labor. | George Newkirk | Farrar |
Sun Jan 23, 1949 | 127A | Former Governor of Massachusetts. | D. G. Caywood | Farrar |
Sun Oct 27, 1946 | 47D | Head of the teamsters' union. | L. K. Peters | Farrar |